Perez, Edgardo Luis (CPSO#: 31284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jan 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:State Univ of New York, Downstate, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
512 Ace st
Stittsville ON  K2V0G1
Phone: 6134353702
Fax: 6134353702
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Edgardo Perez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Perez ( CPSO# 31284 )

Business Address:
512 Ace Street
Stittsville ON  K2V 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 435-3019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDGARDO LUIS PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1980