Perez Falero, Raul Andres (CPSO#: 89832)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Superior Inst of Med Sciences of Havana, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Aug 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2010