Perez, Francisco Eduardo (CPSO#: 33569)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central Del Ecuador Quito, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Serenete Health Clinic
888 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M8Z 1P1
Phone: (416) 251-1919
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCISCO EDUARDO PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 10 Aug 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017