Perez Matta, Maria Manuela (CPSO#: 105341)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad De Los Andes (Chile), 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Chile

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 11 Mar 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017