Perez, Never (CPSO#: 57182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centres
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 4201
Fax: (416) 363-7945
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

32 Zahavy Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 7R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 669-1722
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEVER PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1988