Perez Restrepo, Raul Eduardo (CPSO#: 77034)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 28 Feb 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2003