Perez, Yael (CPSO#: 82972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 848-0001 Ext. 2
Fax: (905) 848-6360
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 31 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YAEL PEREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEREZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010