Perkin, Thomas Reginald (CPSO#: 54856)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone: (519) 676-4736
Fax: (519) 676-2228
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Blenheim Community Village
10 Mary Avenue
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Canada
Phone: (519) 676-8119
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

Fairfield Park Nursing Home
1934 Dufferin Avenue
Wallaceburg ON  N8A 4M2
Canada
Phone: (519) 627-1663
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas R. Perkin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Perkin ( CPSO# 54856 )

Business Address:
30 Chatham Street North
Blenheim ON  N0P 1A0
Phone Number: (519) 676-4736

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS REGINALD PERKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERKIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 31 Aug 1981
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1984