Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Perl, Avishay (CPSO#: 31000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German, Hebrew

Education:University of Basel, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Professional Centre
190 Sherway Drive
Suite 413
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 626-8416
Fax: (416) 626-9286
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Avishay Perl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Perl ( CPSO# 31000 )

Business Address:
North York Seep and Diagnostic Centre
2 Champagne Drive
Unit B15
Toronto ON  M3J 2C5
Phone Number: (416) 642-4232

Business Address:
Queensway Professional Centre
Suite 413
190 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 626-8416

Business Address:
Sleep-Wake Disorder Clinic
Suite 410
213 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1R 3A6

Business Address:
Yonge & Davisville Sleep Clinic
303 - 1835 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 792-9436

Business Address:
Osler Sleep Clinic
140 - 135 Queens Plate Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 231-5770

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVISHAY PERL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 1979