Perlman, Kusiel (CPSO#: 31510)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 18 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1980
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 18 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 18 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 18, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kusiel Perlman, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Perlman to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Perlman has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions on a temporary basis.