Perlmutter, Alan Martin (CPSO#: 55242)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 31 May 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 2012