Perlmutter, David Hyman (CPSO#: 59973)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jul 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1988
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1995
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 04 Nov 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006

Previous Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 30 Oct 1995

On October 30, 1995: 
1.    The Fitness to Practise Committee found that Dr. David H. Perlmutter is an incapacitated 
      member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to subsection 
      69(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code and it is desirable in the public interest 
      that the following conditions be imposed on Dr. Perlmutter s certificate of registration: 
2. That Dr. Perlmutter  undergo treatment with a psychiatrist who is acceptable to the Registrar 
   and who shall file quarterly reports to the College; 
3. That Dr. Perlmutter undergo an anger management program acceptable to both the treating 
   psychiatrist and the Registrar at his own expense and provide proof of attendance; 
4. That, commencing three months after the date of this Order, the Dr. Perlmutter restrict his 
   practice to one location, either one office or emergency shifts in one hospital only; 
5. That Dr. Perlmutter not practise medicine for more than 45 hours of patient care per week; 
6. That, within six months of starting the psychiatric treatment, Dr. Perlmutter undergo a PREP 
   assessment at his own expense to assess his doctor-patient communication skills and ability 
   in comprehension and judgment and, if deficiencies have been identified, undergo upgrading 
   of knowledge and skill and undergo a further PREP assessment within two years thereafter 
   and undergo further upgrading of knowledge or skills; 
7. That Dr. Perlmutter not employ or oversee another physician in his practice, except a 
   physician working as a locum during short absences of the member for purposes of vacation 
   or CME activities; 
8. That Dr. Perlmutter apologize in writing to all victims of his anger episodes who testified 
   during the hearing [11 named persons] and provide the Registrar with copies; 
9. That Dr. Perlmutter comply with general provisions as specified in the Order; 
10. In the event, Dr. Perlmutter fails to comply with any terms or conditions set out in the Order 
   the member s certificate of registration will be suspended immediately by the Registrar. 
11. Either the member or the College may return to request modication of the conditions imposed 
   by the Order or for such other order as the Committee may deem to be just, necessary and 
   appropriate at that time. 
12. Not less than 24 months after the date of this Order, either the member or the College may 
   return to request removal of the conditions imposed upon the member s certificate of 
   registration by the Order. 
In 1996, the College brought a motion to seek to suspend Dr. Perlmutter s certificate of 
registration.  On November 4 and 21, 1996, the Fitness to Practise Committee ordered that Dr. 
Perlmutter s certificate of registration be suspended until the conclusion of the hearing. 
On March 6, 1997, the Fitness to Practice Committee found Dr. Perlmutter in breach of 
paragraphs 3, 4 and 6 of the October 30, 1995 order.  On March 6, 1997 the Committee ordered 
the Registrar to suspend Dr. Perlmutter s certificate of registration until he demonstrates at a 
special hearing for that purpose that he has fully complied with the October 30, 1995 order 
including, without limitation, paragraph 3, 4 and 6 of that Order. 
On June 24, 1997, the Divisional Court dismissed Dr. Perlmutter s appeal of the October 1995 

Appeal: Notice of Appeal