Perng, Richard John (CPSO#: 73418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 358-0171 Ext. 53403
Fax: (905) 358-4908
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z1
Canada
Phone: (905) 358-0171
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

X-Ray and Ultrasound Services
5400 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2G 5X7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard John Perng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Perng ( CPSO# 73418 )

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2E 1Z1
Phone Number: (289) 407-1674

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Diagnostic Imaging
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 358-0171

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD JOHN PERNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 10 Jan 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 11 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2004