Perpick-Breton, Marion Lynn (CPSO#: 66815)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Feb 1997
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 13 Nov 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 14 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 15 Nov 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2006