Perrault-Montgomery, Daniele Jose (CPSO#: 28950)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Perrault, Daniele Jose (used until: 14 Aug 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2013