Perri, Giulia-Anna (CPSO#: 77712)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:McMaster University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Perri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perri ( CPSO# 77712 )

Business Address:
Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (647) 376-7005


Corporation Name: Houman Khosravani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Khosravani ( CPSO# 93444 )
Dr. G. Perri ( CPSO# 77712 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2330

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
North York ON  M4N 3M5

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIULIA-ANNA PERRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2010