Perron, Lygia Beatriz Carvalho (CPSO#: 87105)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2016 to 12 Feb 2017
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2017