Perron, Roger Joseph Wilfried (CPSO#: 56956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Lawrence Medical Clinic
PO Box 772
Suite 100
34 Ottawa Street
Morrisburg ON  K0C 1X0
Phone: (613) 543-2963
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  July 18, 2013
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On August 9, 2013, Guelph General Hospital notified the College that Dr. Roger J.W. Perron's privileges were revoked, effective July 18, 2013.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROGER JOSEPH WILFRIED PERRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2008