Perry, Gad Alexander (CPSO#: 56628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Cancer Centre
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 25395
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Perry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Perry ( CPSO# 56628 )

Business Address:
Regional Cancer Centre
Ottawa Hospital, General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAD ALEXANDER PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1987