Perry, James Ronald (CPSO#: 60792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite A402
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4766
Fax: (416) 480-5054
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James R. Perry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2010

Dr. J. Perry ( CPSO# 60792 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurology Suite A402
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JAMES RONALD PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1990