Perry, Jeffrey Joseph (CPSO#: 71614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Mar 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Center
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.J. Perry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Perry ( CPSO# 71614 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite F647
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JOSEPH PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Jun 1997 to 22 Jul 1997
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 14 Sep 1997 to 09 Oct 1997
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1999