Perry, Scott Robert (CPSO#: 65182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
1750 The Queensway
Etobicoke ON  M9C 5H5
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Englehart and District Hospital Englehart

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT ROBERT PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1993