Perry, Troy Edward (CPSO#: 105396)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Aug 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Division of Paediatric Surgery
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TROY EDWARD PERRY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. PERRY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. PERRY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. PERRY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. PERRY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. PERRY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. PERRY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 Feb 2015 to 08 Mar 2015
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2015 to 25 Oct 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Surgery

University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2016 to 31 Jan 2016
Elective Trainee - Pediatric General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2016 to 14 Feb 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017