Persaud, Baneshwar (CPSO#: 25374)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital 327 Reynolds Street Oakville, ON L6J 3L7
Date Received: 14 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Apr 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Dec 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014