Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Persaud, Desiree Aloma (CPSO#: 67047)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 May 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
Room B3
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4940
Fax: (613) 761-5032
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Desiree Persaud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Persaud ( CPSO# 67047 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
B308 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DESIREE ALOMA PERSAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAUD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 1998