Persaud, Ganeshwar (CPSO#: 65038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
279 Wharncliffe Road North
Suite 103
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone: (519) 645-0100
Fax: (519) 645-0103
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ganeshwar Persaud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Persaud ( CPSO# 65038 )

Business Address:
Suite 103
279 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 2C2
Phone Number: (519) 645-0100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GANESHWAR PERSAUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERSAUD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993