Perumpillichira, Joseph Cherian (CPSO#: 108226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Nov 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Calicut University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital, NAC Epil
McMaster Clinic 7th Floor, Rm 702
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44986
Fax: (905) 527-0059
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joseph Cherian Perumpillichira Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 17 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Perumpillichira ( CPSO# 108226)

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital - NAC Epil
McMaster Clinic, 7th Floor
Room 702
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 906-0222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Apr 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Joseph Cherian Perumpillichira may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Neurology, McMaster University, in which Dr.
                        Perumpillichira holds an academic appointment at the rank of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.
                  Perumpillichira no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This certificate is issued on November 5, 2015, and expires on June 30,
            2018. Upon renewal of Dr. Perumpillichira's academic appointment at McMaster
            University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in
            paragraph 2 above.