Pescarus, Radu (CPSO#: 99071)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Montreal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013