Pessotto, Daniele Antonio (CPSO#: 66945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 579
Ottawa Avenue
South River ON  P0A 1X0
Phone: (705) 386-0512
Fax: (705) 386-0716
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELE ANTONIO PESSOTTO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PESSOTTO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1995