Petcho, Yves Gerard (CPSO#: 84928)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pegasus Medical
Suite 201
1 Hesperus Road
Thornhill ON  L4J 0G9
Phone: (905) 882-4949
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. G. Petcho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Petcho ( CPSO# 84928 )

Business Address:
Pegasus Medical
Suite 201
1 Hesperus Road
Thornhill ON  L4J 0G9
Phone Number: (905) 882-4949

Business Address:
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-7759

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YVES GERARD PETCHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETCHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2008