Petconi, Anca Viorica (CPSO#: 82845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Dec 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone: (807) 737 3030
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anca Petconi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petconi ( CPSO# 82845 )

Business Address:
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANCA VIORICA PETCONI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETCONI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2007