Peterkin, Ian Ralph (CPSO#: 60932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Washington Radiology
Associates
Four Seasons Three
3022 Williams Drive, Suite 104
Fairfax VA  22031
United States
Phone: (703) 698-8803

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Virginia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RALPH PETERKIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERKIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1990