Peters, Christyne Janice (CPSO#: 52646)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
301 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7129
Fax: (905) 472-1416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Peters ( CPSO# 52646 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
301 - 377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7129

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 18 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTYNE JANICE PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987