Peters, Craig (CPSO#: 98201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
WCHC
10 Parkside Dr.
St Jacobs ON  N0B 2N0
Phone: (519) 664-3794
Fax: (519) 664-2182
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Milverton and District Medical
#101 - 50 William St.
Milverton ON  N0K 1M0
Canada
Phone: (519)595-8548
Fax: 519-595-8856
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CRAIG PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014