Peters, Daniel Albert (CPSO#: 86743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 13712
Fax: (613) 761-4635
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel A. Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Peters ( CPSO# 86743 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
P O Box 213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL ALBERT PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2008