Peters, Grant Matthew (CPSO#: 59499)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
One Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705)760-3205
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Millitz/Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Peters ( CPSO# 59499 )
Dr. K. Millitz ( CPSO# 63758 )

Business Address:
Peterborough Civic Hospital
Emergency Department
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5022

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRANT MATTHEW PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 1990