Peters, Judy Ann (CPSO#: 88176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Tecumseh Clinic
11811 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 4M7
Phone: (519) 979-3355
Fax: (519) 979-1429
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 17 Mar 2008 to 04 Apr 2008
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Judy Ann Peters may practise medicine independently in family medicine.