Peters, Leanne Marie (CPSO#: 84489)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: Burnett, Leanne Marie (used until: 18 Dec 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone: (519) 508-1212
Fax: (519) 508-1240
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leanne Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Peters ( CPSO# 84489 )

Business Address:
Avon Family Medicine Centre
511 Huron Street
Stratford ON  N5A 5T8
Phone Number: (519) 508-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LEANNE MARIE PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008