Peters, Rachel Alyssa (CPSO#: 106722)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital FHT
Department of Family Medicine
West Wing 2nd Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5448
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RACHEL ALYSSA PETERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017