Peters, William Bryan (CPSO#: 33215)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.B. Peters Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 22 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Beamsville Medical Centre Family Health Team P.O Box 430 Beamsville ON L0R 1B0
Date Received: 08 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017