Petersen, Karin (CPSO#: 77387)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Apr 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
300 - 24 Selkirk St
Vanier ON  K1L 0A4
Phone: (613) 740-0999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Mactavish and K. Petersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Petersen ( CPSO# 77387 )
Dr. J. Mactavish ( CPSO# 65554 )

Business Address:
300-24 Selkirk Street
Vanier ON  K1L 0A4
Phone Number: (613) 740-0999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Tanzania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARIN PETERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 29 Jul 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003