Peterson, John Curtis (CPSO#: 66603)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 205
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 256-7100
Fax: (416) 231-0623
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CURTIS PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1997