Peterson, Michael Jonathan (CPSO#: 85002)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jan 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
Suite 203
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone: (519) 434-4727
Fax: (519) 434-4700
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mike Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peterson ( CPSO# 85002 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone Number: (519) 434-4727

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2009

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 5, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)