Petit, Lyndal Christine (CPSO#: 80916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Psychiatry
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Fax: (613) 737-8115
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYNDAL CHRISTINE PETIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETIT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 13 Jul 2009 to 12 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2010