Petrasek, Anthony John (CPSO#: 60988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 214
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone: (705) 876-4544
Fax: (705) 876-4548
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony J. Petrasek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petrasek ( CPSO# 60988 )

Business Address:
Alexander Medical Building
214 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough ON  K9J 7H8
Phone Number: (705) 876-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN PETRASEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRASEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990