Petrasek, Anthony (CPSO#: 14652)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Czech, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1953

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain medical records may write to the following address: Attn: Dr. John Petrasek Brampton Civic Hospital W O H C 2100 Bovaird Drive East Brampton, ON L6R 3J7
Date Received: 28 Oct 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1954
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2010