Petrasek, John Stanley (CPSO#: 69188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
W O H C
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John S. Petrasek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Petrasek ( CPSO# 69188 )

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN STANLEY PETRASEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRASEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2001