Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Petrasek, Paul Francis (CPSO#: 58054)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peter Lougheed Centre
Section of Vascular Surgery
3500 26 Avenue NE
Calgary AB  T1Y 6J4
Phone: (403) 943-5507
Fax: (403) 291-2734

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL FRANCIS PETRASEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRASEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1988