Petrella, Robert John (CPSO#: 62275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Suite 2102
London ON  N6G 2M1
Phone: (519) 661-2111 Ext. 22119
Fax: (519) 685-4071
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platt's Lane
London ON  N6G 1S1
Canada
Phone: (519) 672-9660
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Petrella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Petrella ( CPSO# 62275 )

Business Address:
Public Health & Family Medicine
1465 Richmond Street
Suite 2102
London ON  N6G 2M1
Phone Number: (519) 661-2111

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Family Medical Centre
346 Platt's Lane
London ON  N6G 1S1
Phone Number: (519) 672-9660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN PETRELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRELLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1991