Petrella, Teresa Marie (CPSO#: 69955)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4616
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Teresa Petrella Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Petrella ( CPSO# 69955 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room T2-041
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5248

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERESA MARIE PETRELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRELLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2001